GA SB337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A Bill to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to invasion of privacy, so as to include falsely created videographic or still images of other persons within the prohibition against the transmission of photography or videos depicting nudity or sexually explicit conduct of another person under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invasion of Privacy; prohibition against the transmission of photography depicting nudity; include falsely created videographic or still images

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-23HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-22HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-20HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-19HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback