GA SB333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 447
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to deferred compensation plans, so as to provide that the governing authority of a municipality may pay costs or fees associated with an employee's participation in a deferred compensation plan; to provide that certain public employees may be automatically enrolled in deferred compensation plans; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred Compensation Plans; governing authority of a municipality may pay costs/fees associated with employee's participation; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #697 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #423 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 447
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-14HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-06SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-01-31SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-19SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-18SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback