GA SB332 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-130 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from Code Sections 16-11-126 through 16-11-127.2, so as to clarify the judges and Justices who are exempt from various weapons carry laws and prohibitions; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to drivers' licenses, so as to provide for the issuance of personal identification cards to certain judges and Justices of the federal and state judiciary who are exempt from various weapons carry laws and prohibitions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for fees; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Order and Safety; clarify the judges and justices who are exempt; various weapon carry laws and prohibitions
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. JaNice VanNess [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #801 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #527 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #824 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #527 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 379 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-29 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |