GA SB331 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for the issuance of closing protection letters; to provide for definitions; to provide for premiums regarding such letters; to provide for certain reserves; to authorize the Commissioner of Insurance to promulgate rules and regulations with regard to such matters; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; closing protection letters; provide for premiums; authorize Commissioner of Insurance to promulgate rules and regulations
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Vote #709 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #475 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #475 - Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-02 | Act 734 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-20 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-17 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Read and Referred |