GA SB327 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 351
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 351
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 16 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to death investigations, so as to clarify when a medical examiner's inquiry is required to be conducted; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Death Investigations; medical examiner's inquiry is required to be conducted; clarify
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #790 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #745 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #404 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #745 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #404 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 351 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |