GA SB322 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to game and fish, so as to provide protection for certain wildlife habitats; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and Fish; provide protection for certain wildlife habitats
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Tommie Williams [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #787 (Y: 152 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 557 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |