GA SB320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board, so as to provide a penalty for persons who are classified as sexually dangerous predators who fail to verify or update registration information as required by law; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sexual Offender Registration Review Board; sexually dangerous predators who fail to verify or update registration information; provide penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #495 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |