GA SB32 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-31 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of probate judge of Bibb County shall be nonpartisan elections held at the time of certain general primary elections; to provide for submission of this Act under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bibb County; provide future nonpartisan elections for office of probate judge
Sponsors
Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #15 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |