GA SB314 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to invasions of privacy, so as to prohibit sexual extortion; to provide for definitions; to provide for elements of the crime; to provide for penalties; to provide for venue; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Invasions of Privacy; prohibit sexual extortion; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |