GA SB310 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to education, so as to prohibit the implementation of certain grants affecting education policy regarding pre-kindergarten through grade 12 education until a written analysis is provided and the grant terms are ratified by the General Assembly; to provide for a definition; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Transparency in Education Act"; prohibit implementation of certain grants; written analysis; grant terms are ratified by Gen. Assembly
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |