GA SB31 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 9 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to privilege, so as to extend the attorney-client privilege to third persons under certain circumstances; to correct cross-references; to amend Code Section 17-16-94 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to disclosure required by the prosecuting attorney and defendant, to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; extend the attorney-client privilege to third persons under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Jason Carter [D] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] |
Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. Mitch Seabaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #36 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House First Readers | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Read and Referred |