GA SB309 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 14 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certain programs and activities under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that high schools that receive state funding cannot participate in an athletic association which prohibits religious expression on the clothing of student athletes; to provide that high schools that receive state funding cannot participate in an athletic association which prohibits member schools from organizing and playing scrimmage matches, games, or other athletic competitions with nonmember schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; high school that receive state funding cannot participate in athletic association which prohibits religious expression on clothing of student athletes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House Vote #725 (Y: 123 N: 34 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #464 (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-01 Effective Date
2016-05-03 Act 522
2016-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2016-03-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2016-03-10HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2016-03-10HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2016-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-02-19HouseHouse First Readers
2016-02-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-02-18SenateSenate Third Read
2016-02-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2016-02-11SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-02-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback