GA SB306 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Mountain Park ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Exemption; City of Mountain Park; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #399 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-01-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-08SenateSenate Hopper
2017-12-01SenateSenate Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback