GA SB30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for Sustainable Community School Operational Grants; to provide for definitions; to provide for planning and implementation grants; to provide for applications for grants; to require the development of community school plans; to provide for requirements for grant recipients; to delineate the purposes for which grant funds may be used; to provide for reports; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sustainable Community School Operational Grants; definitions; planning and implementation grants; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Fort [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Curt Thompson [D] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #159 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |