GA SB3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to child custody proceedings, so as to provide for the creation, authorization, procedure, revocation, and termination of a power of attorney from a parent to another person for the temporary delegation of certain power and authority for the care of a minor child; to provide a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Supporting and Strengthening Families Act'; power of attorney from parent to another person; care of minor child; provide for
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 (Y: 43 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |