GA SB297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a method of compensating the members of the board of education of Hall County, approved February 25, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 3504), as amended, so as to revise such compensation; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hall County; board of education members; compensation; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Supplemental Local Calendars: House Vote #347 (Y: 137 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #236 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #236 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 128 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |