GA SB296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 18 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to funeral directors and establishments, embalmers, and crematories, so as to remove certain crematory requirements as to retorts and to provide for an alternative cremation process; to provide for and change a definition; to provide for conforming amendments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Funeral Directors and Embalmers; alternative cremation process; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #446 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #447 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |