GA SB296 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Jekyll Island—State Park Authority, so as to revise the powers and responsibilities of the authority; to define terms; to revise the components of the master plan; to clarify development powers and restrictions for the authority; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Park Authority; revise the powers and responsibilities
Sponsors
Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #737 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #429 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #429 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-14 | Act 480 | |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |