GA SB294 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-20-87 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to eligible large retirement systems authorized to invest in certain alternative investments, so as to permit the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia to invest in alternative investments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; invest in alternative investments; permit
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - House - House Vote #690 (Y: 104 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #486 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #486 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 522 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-20 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-19 | House | House Postponed |
2020-06-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |