GA SB293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish in DeKalb County, Georgia, districts from which the members of the County Board of Education of DeKalb County shall be elected, approved April 12, 1963 (Ga. L. 1963, p. 3424), as amended, so as to provide conditions upon the expansion of the boundaries of the City of Decatur independent school systems that are extended by annexation by the City of Decatur; to provide constitutional authority and legislative purpose; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; conditions upon the expansion of the boundaries of the City of Decatur independent school systems; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Kim Jackson [D] |
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #312 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #228 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #228 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-05-10 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 282 | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |