GA SB290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the composition of the Board of Education of Evans County, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4782), as amended, so as to revise the compensation of the board; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Evans County; compensation of the board; revise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #312 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 124 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |