GA SB29 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to education, so as to require testing of drinking water in child care learning centers and schools for lead contamination; to provide for definitions; to provide for notice and reporting of test results and remediation plans; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for an exemption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; drinking water in child care learning centers and for lead contamination; require testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #157 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |