GA SB288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-3-37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to review of individual's criminal history record information, definitions, privacy considerations, written application requesting review, and inspection, so as to provide for the automatic restriction of certain criminal history record information of arrests when there has been a final disposition other than a conviction or a certain time period and conditions are met since a conviction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal History Record Information; automatic restriction; final disposition other than a conviction; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #707 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #741 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #612 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #741 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #612 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 582 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |