GA SB288 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 14 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certain programs and activities under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that no high school which receives funding under the "Quality Basic Education Act" shall participate in or sponsor interscholastic sports events conducted by any athletic association unless the association releases annual financial reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; provide no high school which receives funding under the "Quality Basic Education Act"; shall participate in/or sponsor interscholastic sport events conducted by any athletic association
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #884 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #741 (Y: 165 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #440 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #741 (Y: 165 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #440 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 553 | |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 49th, 47th, 25th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Insists |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 54th, 53rd, 45th |
2014-03-20 | House | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |