GA SB288 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physicians, so as to authorize the administration of vaccines by pharmacists or nurses pursuant to vaccine protocol agreements with physicians; to provide for definitions; to provide requirements for the content of vaccine protocol agreements; to provide that a party to a vaccine protocol agreement shall not delegate his or her authority; to limit the number of vaccine protocol agreements into which a physician may enter at any one time; to prohibit certain entities from entering into vaccine protocol agreements; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for limited liability; to provide for applicability; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Physicians; authorize the administration of vaccines by pharmacists/nurses; vaccine protocol agreements with physicians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #559 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-07 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Read and Referred |