GA SB283 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to reconstitute and reestablish the board of elections and registration for Lincoln County, Georgia; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lincoln County; board of elections and registration; reconstitute and reestablish
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #263 (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #197 (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #197 (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 121 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hopper |