GA SB276 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county law libraries, so as to allow county governing authorities to authorize the charging and collection of law library fees in county recorders' courts and magistrate courts; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County Law Libraries; authorize the charging and collection of law library fees in county recorders' courts and magistrate courts; allow county governing authorities
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #849 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #165 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #165 (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |