GA SB275 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a homestead exemption from certain Bartow County School District ad valorem taxes for educational purposes for certain residents of that school district who are 65 years of age or older, approved April 5, 1994 (Ga. L. 1994, p. 4904), as amended by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3669), so as to increase the exemption amount; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bartow County School District Ad Valorem Taxes; homestead exemption; increase exemption amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Supplemental Local Calendars: House Vote #347 (Y: 137 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #209 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #209 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |