GA SB271 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, and Code Section 47-2-263 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to credit for certain past service as an assistant district attorney or employee of the Prosecuting Attorneys' Council, payment of employee contributions, and credit for service as a full-time law assistant, so as to rename law assistants as law clerks and staff attorneys; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Assistants; rename as law clerks and staff attorneys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #504 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-03-02SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback