GA SB270 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 398
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating and providing a new charter for the City of Trenton in Dade County, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4725), as amended, so as to change the position of city clerk from elective to appointive; to provide for the current city clerk to serve out the remainder of his or her term; to provide for the appointment of city clerks; to provide for the election of certain city officers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Trenton in Dade County; position of city clerk from elective to appointive; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #677 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #415 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #415 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 398 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |