GA SB270 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to authorize persons who are qualified retired law enforcement officers to carry a handgun anywhere within this state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; authorize qualified retired law enforcement officers to carry handgun anywhere within this state
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #736 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #878 (Y: 112 N: 46 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #825 (Y: 114 N: 50 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #460 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #878 (Y: 112 N: 46 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #825 (Y: 114 N: 50 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #460 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 524 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |