GA SB268 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a Board of Education of Jones County, approved March 21, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 4459), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 30, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3836), so as to provide that future elections for board of education members shall be conducted on a nonpartisan basis; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Education of Jones County; provide that future elections for members shall be conducted on a nonpartisan basis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Vote #762 - Passage (Y: 120 N: 30 NV: 18 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #287 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-12 | Act 557 | |
2012-04-12 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | House Second Readers | |
2011-04-14 | House First Readers | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read and Referred |