GA SB263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 548
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Eagles Landing; to provide a charter for the City of Eagles Landing; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for a referendum; to provide effective dates; to provide for transition of powers and duties; to provide for community improvement districts; to provide for directory nature of dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Eagles Landing; incorporate; charter; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #813 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #795 (Y: 102 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #796 (Y: 70 N: 99 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #469 (Y: 28 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 548
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-23HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2018-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-15SenateSenate Notice to Reconsider
2018-02-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-15SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/263
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166790.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173286.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173792.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173810.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174051.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175949.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178790.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178788.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178792.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178794.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/179015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15703
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16191
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16190
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16407

Bill Comments

feedback