GA SB263 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide that the governing authority of each municipality and county in this state and each board of education which employs sworn police officers who are P.O.S.T. certified may adopt policies under which such sworn officers, upon their retirement or upon leaving such employment as a result of a disability arising in the line of duty, may retain his or her weapon and badge; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers; provide governing authority; employs sworn police officers who are P.O.S.T certified; policies; disability in line of duty
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House Vote #752 (Y: 123 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #424 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #424 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 609 | |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |