GA SB260 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 2-12-80 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to promulgation and adoption of rules and regulations and sharing of information, so as to exclude certain soil amendments from regulation; to limit locally adopted buffers and setbacks; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Soil Amendments; exclude from regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #394 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #331 (Y: 92 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #325 (Y: 92 N: 68 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #324 (Y: 87 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #163 (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #331 (Y: 92 N: 69 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #325 (Y: 92 N: 68 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #324 (Y: 87 N: 75 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #163 (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 220 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Reconsidered |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |