GA SB252 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physicians, physician's assistants, and others, so as to provide for the certification of polysomnographic technologists; to provide a short title; to provide legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for applications to be made to the Composite State Board of Medical Examiners to obtain certification to practice polysomnography; to provide for powers and duties of the board; to provide for certification standards and requirements; to provide for the issuance and renewal of certification; to provide for permitted and prohibited activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Polysomnography Practice Act; provide for the certification of polysomnographic technologists
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Donald Thomas [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #875 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #198 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #198 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-27 | Act 489 | |
2010-05-27 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Read and Referred |