GA SB246 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for the DeKalb County Board of Registration and Elections, approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4200), as amended, so as to provide that board members shall be appointed by the chief judge of the superior court; to provide for the nomination of potential board members; to update provisions regarding the certification of members appointed to the board; to provide for the selection of a chairman; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County Board of Registration and Elections; board members; appoint and nominate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #329 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 287 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |