GA SB241 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Special Committee on Election Integrity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to comprehensively revise elections and voting; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the establishment of a voter intimidation and illegal election activities hotline; to limit the ability of the State Election Board and the Secretary of State to enter into certain consent agreements; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding administrative procedure, so as to provide for the submission and suspension of emergency rules by the State Election Board; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections and Voting; revise comprehensively

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #169 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #168 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 213, Sb 241, Sr 100, Sb 62, Sb 69, Sb 71, Sb 72: Senate Vote #155 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-08SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-23SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback