GA SB240 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 31 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to incorporation of municipal corporations, so as to provide that no municipal charter shall be enacted where a portion of the proposed corporate boundary was ever part of an existing municipality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Incorporation of Municipal Corporations; no municipal charter shall be enacted where a portion of the proposed corporate boundary was ever part of existing municipality; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |