GA SB239 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V16
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Veto V16
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to school attendance in elementary and secondary education, so as to revise certain provisions relating to mandatory attendance; to require new residents in a local school system to enroll a child within 30 days; to provide for reporting violations of mandatory attendance requirements; to provide that a local school system official who fails to make certain reports is guilty of a misdemeanor; to provide that a person who fails to enroll a child is guilty of a misdemeanor; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; mandatory attendance; provisions; require new residents in a local school system to enroll a child within 30 days
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Buckner [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Vincent Fort [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Ronald Ramsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #895 - Agree To House Substitute As Amended (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Veto V16 | |
2010-06-08 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-17 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred |