GA SB236 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Juvenile Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-391 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or other intoxicating substances, penalties, publication of notice of conviction for persons convicted for a second time, and endangering a child, so as to require that the county department of family and children services be notified when certain offenders are convicted for endangering a child by driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Driving Under the Influence; county department of family and children services be notified; endangering; require
Sponsors
Sen. Donzella James [D] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. Gail Davenport [D] |
Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #555 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |