GA SB234 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to civil practice, so as to provide for uniform laws governing mediation and participants in mediation; to provide for definitions; to provide for privileges against disclosure, admissibility, and discovery; to provide for waiver and preclusion of privilege; to provide for exceptions to privilege; to provide for confidentiality and mediator disclosure of conflicts; to provide for international commercial mediation and electronic signatures; to provide for uniformity of construction and severability; to provide for applicability; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Uniform Mediation Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #298 (Y: 159 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #178 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #178 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 268 | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |