GA SB229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that the tax commissioner of the Columbus Consolidated Government shall retain a specified percentage of school taxes collected by said commissioner and remit the same to the governing authority of Columbus Consolidated Government to reimburse the consolidated government for the cost of collecting school taxes; to provide for a statement of intention and the authority for this Act; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Columbus Consolidated Government Tax Commissioner; retain a specified percentage of school taxes; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |