GA SB227 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 2 of Part 1 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to compulsory attendance for students in elementary and secondary education, so as to provide that declarations of intent and attendance records for home study programs are submitted to the Department of Education rather than local school superintendents; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; declarations of intent/attendance records for home study programs; submitted to Dept. of Education rather than local school superintendents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #868 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #733 - Passage (Y: 137 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #733 - Passage (Y: 137 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #449 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-25 | Act 627 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-03 | House First Readers | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred |