GA SB225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding the Juvenile Code, so as to bring such provisions in conformity with the federal Social Security Act and the Family First Prevention Services Act; to amend Articles 3 and 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to dependency proceedings and termination of parental rights; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 49 of the O.C.G.A., relating to children and youth services;to amend Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Office of State Administrative Hearings; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Code; in conformity with the federal Social Security Act and the Family First Prevention Services Act; bring provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #310 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #281 (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #139 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective Date
2019-05-07 Act 278
2019-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback