GA SB222 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide that all costs and expenses relating to election administration are paid for with lawfully appropriate public funds; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Primaries and Elections; all costs and expenses relating to election administration are paid for with lawfully appropriate public funds; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Shawn Still [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #354 (Y: 32 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #334 (Y: 100 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Agree To Committee Report: House Vote #333 (Y: 100 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Table: House Vote #332 (Y: 67 N: 101 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #129 (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #128 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #114 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #334 (Y: 100 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Agree To Committee Report: House Vote #333 (Y: 100 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Table: House Vote #332 (Y: 67 N: 101 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #129 (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #128 (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Senate Vote #114 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 273 | |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-27 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |