GA SB220 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical practice, so as to repeal requirements for advertising or publicizing of medical specialty certification; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medical Practice; requirements for advertising or publicizing of medical specialty certification; repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50838 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/165997 |