GA SB220 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Board of Regents, so as to provide for multiyear lease agreements; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Regents; provide multiyear lease agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #185 - Passage As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-21 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred |