GA SB219 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles, so as to provide for definitions; to provide for the operation of motor vehicles with automated driving systems on certain public roads; to provide for submission of certain information to the Department of Revenue to operate motor vehicles with automated driving systems; to provide for the operation of motor vehicles with such systems in certain locations; to provide for notice to local governing authorities; to provide for the collection of data from the operation of such motor vehicles; to provide for the submission of information and data to the General Assembly by the manufacturer of motor vehicles with automated driving systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles; definitions; operation of motor vehicles with automated driving systems on certain public roads; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #317 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #148 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 151 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #148 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 214 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |