GA SB217 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, so as to provide for the offense of operation of a motor vehicle with a fraudulent license plate; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Eliminating Ghost Plates Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #325 (Y: 110 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #186 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #186 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |